THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:03:23 PM
Mortera, Genevieve
CPSO#:
98039
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
66 University Campus NW
University Health Centre
University of Alberta
2-200 Students' Union Building
Edmonton AB T6G 2J7
Phone: 780-492-2612
Fax: 780-248-1193
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MORTERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2015 |