THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 6:19:12 AM
Gall, Robert Christopher McLellan
CPSO#:
98008
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT CHRISTOPHER MCLELLAN GALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2014 |