THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 4:28:40 AM
Skaff, Elie Robbie
CPSO#:
97887
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200-110 Bearbrook Road
Ottawa ON K1B 5R2
Phone: (613) 824-6318
Fax: (613) 824-0521
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Sep 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIE ROBBIE SKAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKAFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2016 |