THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:38:59 AM
Doad, Ajinder Kaur
CPSO#:
97695
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Russian, Urdu
Education: Kharkov Medical University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Tower Hill Medical Centre
380 Tower HIll Road , Unit 17
Richmond Hill ON L4E 0T8
Phone: 289-475-6104
Fax: 905-770-9579
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AJINDER KAUR DOAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2014 |