THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 2:38:03 AM
Khachatryan, Davit
CPSO#:
97653
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Armenian, English, Russian
Education: Yerevan State Medical University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711 Ext. 34403
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site |
Whitby |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVIT KHACHATRYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHACHATRYAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2017 |