THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:49:48 PM
Morellato, John Thomas
CPSO#:
97632
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Address Not provided
Jackson MS 39110
United States
Phone: 601-984-1111
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Mississippi
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS MORELLATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORELLATO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2019 |