THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:25:01 PM
Asmer, Mehmet Selim
CPSO#:
97565
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St, PO Box 1800
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7011
Fax: (905) 472-7371
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEHMET SELIM ASMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |