THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:13:56 AM
Bell, Katherine Frances
CPSO#:
97528
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Burleigh, Katherine Frances (used until: 11 Dec 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Prince Edward Island
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 30 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2021 |