THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:39:13 PM
Rubin, Tamar Sarah
CPSO#:
97425
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
01 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:15 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Apr 2012 to 20 May 2012
EL - Paediatric Respirology
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 09 Mar 2014
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 08 Feb 2016 to 04 Mar 2016
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2016 to 01 May 2016
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2016 |