THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 18:50:49 PM
Freeman, Laura Michele
CPSO#:
97397
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Apr 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2021 |