THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:29:06 PM
Laks, Jessica Allison
CPSO#:
97240
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Nov 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2012 to 07 Mar 2012
EL - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2013 to 18 Sep 2013
EL - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2021 |