THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:42:20 PM
Hay, Annette Elizabeth
CPSO#:
97154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dundee, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Hematology
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135496666 Ext. 7404
Fax: 6135482470
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:01 Jul 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2012 to 24 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 Jun 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jun 2020 |
|
Active |