THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:31:28 AM
Parry, Dominic James
CPSO#:
97147
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Leicester, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dominic Parry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:01 Aug 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 19 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 31 Mar 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2022 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2022 |
|
Active |