THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:08:11 PM
Vali, Reza
CPSO#:
97095
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:18 Feb 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 08 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Oct 2014
CF - Pediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Sep 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Feb 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Feb 2022 |
|
Active |