THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:08:10 PM
Arif, Beenish
CPSO#:
97077
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Dow Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 14-15
1145 Morningside Avenue
Toronto ON M1B 0A7
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: (647) 352-3628
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 May 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
|
Active |