THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:00:40 PM
Walker, Bradley Douglas
CPSO#:
97042
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institut
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: 613-696-7381 Ext. 67381
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRADLEY DOUGLAS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2015 to 17 Jan 2016
EL - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2018 |