THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:02:01 PM
Nikolsky, Victor
CPSO#:
97024
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Nikolsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Sep 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTOR NIKOLSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKOLSKY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2012 |