THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:01:57 PM
Badawi, Mohamed Wael Mahmoud
CPSO#:
96985
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
02 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Al-Azhar University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 20 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2013 to 02 Apr 2014
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2014 |