THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:51:37 AM
Saxena, Puja
CPSO#:
96948
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Chakerwarti, Puja (used until: 06 Feb 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: National University of Ireland, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
169 Queen St. E. Suite 102
Brampton ON L6V 1B3
Phone: 905 216 0663
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PUJA SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2018 |