THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:24:23 AM
Gleba, Heather Joy
CPSO#:
96933
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
786 Goderich St
Port Elgin ON N0H 2C3
Phone: 2264532230
Fax: 2262771122
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER JOY GLEBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEBA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 23 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jan 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 04 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2014 |