THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 0:38:48 AM
Richards, Enoka Geraldine
CPSO#:
96927
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Swaminathan, Enoka Geraldine (used until: 01 Oct 2020 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 Dundas Street East
Unit 5
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 888-350-2323
Fax: 833-479-0224
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ENOKA GERALDINE RICHARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |