THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:50:04 PM
Anderson, Christopher
CPSO#:
96915
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: (519) 252-3632
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |