THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:20:36 PM
Salmon, Gretchen Jennifer
CPSO#:
96897
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2022 |