THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:25:15 PM
Qanungo, Muhammed Tariq Khan
CPSO#:
96874
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
20 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Oct-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Muhammed Qanungo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 20 Oct 2019 |