THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:18:59 PM
Wallace, Elaine Margaret
CPSO#:
96856
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
27 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: National University of Ireland, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 07 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 08 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Sep 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Sep 2012 |