THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 23:40:02 PM
Andrade Banuelos, Andrea Valeria
CPSO#:
96806
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 56314
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Nov 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |