THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:02:18 AM
Dwivedi, Girish
CPSO#:
96790
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
01 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Delhi, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Girish Dwivedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2011 to 09 Nov 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 10 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2017 |