THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:20:06 PM
Anees, Farah
CPSO#:
96778
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
15810 Midway Rd
Addison TX 75001
United States
Phone: 9724588111
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Farah Anees Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Alaska
USA - Arizona
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Connecticut
USA - Delaware
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Hawaii
USA - Illinois
USA - Indiana
USA - Iowa
USA - Kansas
USA - Kentucky
USA - Louisiana
USA - Maine
USA - Maryland
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota
USA - Mississippi
USA - Missouri
USA - Nebraska
USA - Nevada
USA - New Hampshire
USA - New Jersey
USA - North Carolina
USA - Ohio
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Oregon
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Rhode Island
USA - South Carolina
USA - Tennessee
USA - Texas
USA - Utah
USA - Vermont
USA - Virginia
USA - Washington
USA - West Virginia
USA - Wisconsin
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Jan 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jan 2013 |
|
Active |