THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:19:50 PM
Qaisy, Yehia Saad
CPSO#:
96708
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3420 Hurontario St
unit 101
Mississauga ON L5B 4A9
Phone: 905-272-0165
Fax: 905-272-4082
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YEHIA SAAD QAISY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QAISY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2012 |