THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:45:45 AM
Warraich, Gunwant
CPSO#:
96689
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
13 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sandhu, Gunwant (used until: 09 Aug 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Manitoba, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
EL - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 14 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2015 |