THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:48:51 AM
Casey, Michelle Renee
CPSO#:
96666
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michelle Casey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:As of Sept 1, 2022:
Dr. Sonia Fawcett.
Richmond Medical Clinic.
2-6265 Perth St. Richmond, ON K0A 2Z0
Date Received: 25 Aug 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |