THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:30:32 AM
Chan, Chris Ching Wai
CPSO#:
96478
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Tri-Hospital Sleep Laboratory West
3024 Hurontario Street
Suite 208
Mississauga ON L5B 4M4
Phone: 905-566-1010
Fax: 905-566-0440
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Record Storage and Retrieval Service
111 St Regis Cres. South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1
C/O Dr. C. Chan (96478)
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:12 Mar 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRIS CHING WAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Jul 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2013 |