THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:31:00 PM
Ali, Kevin Fareez
CPSO#:
96374
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 001
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Phone: (705) 737-1532
Fax: 7057373703
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kevin F. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical records may email: [email protected]
Date Received: 09 Nov 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN FAREEZ ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2017 |