THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:20:10 AM
Ade-Conde, Omotola Ibitayo Laura
CPSO#:
96281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Adegboyega-Conde, Omotola Ibitayo Laura (used until: 05 Mar 2020 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Lagos, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
OakvilleTrafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4800
Fax: (905) 845-6419
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Omotola Adegboyega-Conde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMOTOLA IBITAYO LAURA ADE-CONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADE-CONDE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2013 |