THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:29:28 PM
Vera Badillo, Francisco Emilio
CPSO#:
96275
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 4501
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:18 Sep 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Jun 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |