THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:03:06 AM
Schnarr, Kara Lynne
CPSO#:
96153
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V5C2
Phone: 9053879495
Fax: 9055756326
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:12 Mar 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARA LYNNE SCHNARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNARR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2016 to 12 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Mar 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2017 |