THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:24:12 PM
Magalhaes, Joyce Kellen Rodrigues De Souza
CPSO#:
96105
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal De Goias, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Department of Anesthesia
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-845-2571
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOYCE KELLEN RODRIGUES DE SOUZA MAGALHAES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGALHAES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |