THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
14/05/24 23:27:55 PM
Jiang, Helen
CPSO#:
95997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Hospital
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Feb 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HELEN JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2013 to 01 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2014 |