THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:16:21 PM
Gale, Jenna
CPSO#:
95976
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Fertility Centre
955 Green Valley Crescent #100
Ottawa ON K2C3V4
Phone: 6136863378
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:03 Apr 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNA GALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2017 |