THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 6:42:32 AM
Mattia, Alicia Marie
CPSO#:
95647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:17 Jul 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALICIA MARIE MATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2017 |