THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:43:30 PM
Labib, Mahmoud
CPSO#:
95400
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mahmoud Labib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 10 Apr 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |