THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:15:40 PM
Breslavets, Maksym Valeriyovych
CPSO#:
95302
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Doneck Medical University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
220-1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON L1V 6R6
Phone: (905) 493-5700
Fax: (905) 493-1170
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAKSYM VALERIYOVYCH BRESLAVETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRESLAVETS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |