THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:59:57 AM
Yu, Jeffrey Yao Chiun
CPSO#:
95295
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
Room B9-100
339 Windermere Rd.
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2958
Fax: (519) 663-3062
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY YAO CHIUN YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |