THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:55:46 AM
Tam, Alan Ka Ho
CPSO#:
95165
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Rehabiliation Institute
Room 10-107
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3865
Fax: 416-597-7107
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN KA HO TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |