THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:33:27 PM
Wesolowski, Marta Anna
CPSO#:
95072
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
L L 02
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6846
Fax: (705) 740-6847
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jul 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTA ANNA WESOLOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESOLOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 30 May 2011 to 13 Jun 2011
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2013 |