THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:10:58 AM
McBride, Eileen Richelle Agnes
CPSO#:
95027
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 Bay St
St Martha's Regional Hospital
Antigonish Pediatrics
Antigonish NS B2G 2G5
Phone: 9028671417
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Eileen McBride Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 12 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Qatar
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:30 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:25 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EILEEN RICHELLE AGNES MCBRIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCBRIDE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2011 |