THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:17:01 AM
Rajan, Tasleem Anar
CPSO#:
94925
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2011 to 08 May 2011
EL - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 09 Mar 2014
EL - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2015 |