THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:10:23 AM
Alshahrani, Ali Mohamed G
CPSO#:
94844
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 28 Feb 2011 to 27 Mar 2011
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Nov 2017
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2014 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |