THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 21:31:16 PM
Aoyama, Kazuyoshi
CPSO#:
94836
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Japanese
Education: Nagoya City University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 2929
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Japan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Critical Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 May 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2023 |
|
Active |