THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:57:44 AM
Zylberberg Serman, Alejandro Daniel
CPSO#:
94723
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Catholic University of Chile, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 26 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2011 |